LA HB35 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for retirement eligibility of employees of state hospitals under certain conditions (OR +$13,851,000 APV)
Title
Provides for retirement eligibility of employees of state hospitals under certain conditions (OR +$13,851,000 APV)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2013-02-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2013. |
2013-02-21 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2013-02-21 | House | Prefiled. |