LA HB349 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Effective date: 06/22/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the delivery of alcoholic beverages (EN INCREASE SG RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the delivery of alcoholic beverages (EN INCREASE SG RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 349 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1041) (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 349 ADOPT (#1030) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 349 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#892) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 349 FINAL PASSAGE (#859) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 349 AMENDMENT # 2152 BY CHABERT HB 349 BY CARMODY (#858) (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 349 FINAL PASSAGE (#204) (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-30HouseEffective date: 06/22/2019.
2019-06-22HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 433.
2019-06-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-06HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-06SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-06HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 86, nays 10. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2019-06-06HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-06SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 6 nays.
2019-06-06HouseConference Committee report received.
2019-06-04SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Donahue, Gary Smith, and White.
2019-06-04HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2019-06-04SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2019-06-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Carmody, Jackson, and Jimmy Harris.
2019-06-03SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2019-06-03HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 5. The Senate amendments, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were rejected. Conference committee appointment pending.
2019-06-02HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-02SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-06-02SenateRules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
2019-05-21SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended.
2019-05-16SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-15SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-14SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-09SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2019-05-08SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-07HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 77, nays 16. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-07HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-07HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/07/19.
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-25HouseReported with amendments (11-4).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB349&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121348
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127724
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132311
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143552
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144982
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127228
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127674
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128078
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128051
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141274
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140095
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137905
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135681
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141281
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141494
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141599
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141960
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121382
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127223
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127899
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129091
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132337
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133637
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143487
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143857
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145644
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132210
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141291
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143493
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143513

Bill Comments

feedback