LA HB348 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to public-private partnerships (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to public-private partnerships (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 348 FINAL PASSAGE (#63) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-21SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-30SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-04-29SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-25HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-25HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-04-25HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-04-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/25/19.
2019-04-23HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-22HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback