LA HB348 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-17-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Effective date: July 7, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-17-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Effective date: July 7, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the amount of the tax credit for the rehabilitation of certain residential structures and extends the taxable periods in which the tax credit applies (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Increases the amount of the tax credit for the rehabilitation of certain residential structures and extends the taxable periods in which the tax credit applies (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - House - House Vote on HB 348, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#794) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 348, FINAL PASSAGE (#666) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 348, FINAL PASSAGE (#475) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 348, FINAL PASSAGE (#666) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 348, FINAL PASSAGE (#475) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-07 | Effective date: July 7, 2011. | |
2011-07-07 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 412. | |
2011-06-22 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-22 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-21 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-21 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2011-06-20 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2011. | |
2011-06-19 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2011. | |
2011-06-16 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/19/2011. | |
2011-06-16 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2011-06-16 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-15 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-14 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-14 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-13 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2011-06-08 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2011-06-08 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-06 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/8/2011. | |
2011-06-06 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-02 | Reported favorably (15-0) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled. |