LA HB347 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-22 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-22 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Establishes certain ad valorem property tax exemptions (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Establishes certain ad valorem property tax exemptions (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-15 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0-1). |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported favorably (9-7). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2020-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2020-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |