LA HB345 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to alcoholic beverage laws (EN INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to alcoholic beverage laws (EN INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 345 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#708) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 345 FINAL PASSAGE (#540) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House Vote on HB 345 FINAL PASSAGE (#87) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 345 FINAL PASSAGE (#540) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House Vote on HB 345 FINAL PASSAGE (#87) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2014. |
2014-05-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 57. |
2014-05-12 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2014-04-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2014. |
2014-04-28 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-03-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-03-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/25/2014. |
2014-03-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-17 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2014-02-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2014-02-25 | House | Prefiled. |