LA HB344 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-25 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Hearing: May 29 @ 10:00 am in Room A-B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the use of solitary confinement for certain persons

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the use of solitary confinement for certain persons

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 344 FINAL PASSAGE (#312) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2020-05-22HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-18HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-15HouseReported with amendments (10-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-02-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-02-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback