LA HB341 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to motor vehicles and energy sources for motor vehicles
Title
Provides relative to motor vehicles and energy sources for motor vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-03-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/21/2024. |
2024-03-20 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |