LA HB341 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends laws relative to behavioral health and mental health to provide for current practice and appropriate terminology
Title
Amends laws relative to behavioral health and mental health to provide for current practice and appropriate terminology
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 341 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#904) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 341 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#834) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 341 FINAL PASSAGE (#797) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 341 FINAL PASSAGE (#276) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 341 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#834) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 341 FINAL PASSAGE (#797) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 341 FINAL PASSAGE (#276) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | House | Effective date: 08/01/17. |
2017-06-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 369. |
2017-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-07 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2017-06-07 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-06-07 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Notice the House reconsidered the rejection of Senate amendments. |
2017-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/07/17. |
2017-06-07 | House | Read by title. Motion to Reject Senate amendments Reconsidered. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2017-06-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Dustin Miller, Hoffmann, and Havard. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2017-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17. |
2017-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-11 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/17. |
2017-05-03 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-03-30 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-03-30 | House | Prefiled. |