LA HB340 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/19.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to real estate appraisers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to real estate appraisers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 340 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#527) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 340 FINAL PASSAGE (#342) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 340 FINAL PASSAGE (#93) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30HouseEffective date: 08/01/19.
2019-05-30HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 37.
2019-05-28HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-05-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-28HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-05-16HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/22/19.
2019-05-14HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-05-14SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-13SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-09SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-08SenateReported with amendments.
2019-05-01SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2019-04-30SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-29HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-29HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/29/19.
2019-04-24HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-23HouseReported with amendments (13-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2019-03-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2019-03-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB340&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120783
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126444
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128784
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137132
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142523
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143866
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125781
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126425
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128591
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132500
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135457
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137013
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120784
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126745
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128851
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132514
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128747
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134037

Bill Comments

feedback