LA HB338 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-12 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-12 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits charter schools from requiring parents to provide certain student information as a condition of enrollment in the school
Title
Prohibits charter schools from requiring parents to provide certain student information as a condition of enrollment in the school
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Withdrawn from the files of the House. |
2016-04-12 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Education. |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |