LA HB338 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-09 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 33, nays 56. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-09 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 33, nays 56. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits drivers from using handheld cellular devices while driving
Title
Prohibits drivers from using handheld cellular devices while driving
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 338, FINAL PASSAGE (#493) (Y: 33 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 33, nays 56. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/9/2011. | |
2011-06-07 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-06 | Reported with amendments (8-3-1) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled. |