LA HB337 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 31. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 31. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Restricts the safety helmet requirement to motorcycle riders and operators and riders under the age of twenty-one
Title
Restricts the safety helmet requirement to motorcycle riders and operators and riders under the age of twenty-one
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 337 FINAL PASSAGE (#494) (Y: 49 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Vote on HB 337 FINAL PASSAGE (#401) (Y: 49 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Vote on HB 337 FINAL PASSAGE (#401) (Y: 49 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 31. Failed to pass. |
2016-04-26 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-04-26 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2016. |
2016-04-21 | House | Notice given. |
2016-04-21 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2016-04-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 46. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. |
2016-04-20 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-04-20 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2016-04-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2016. |
2016-04-19 | House | Notice given. |
2016-04-19 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-04-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2016. |
2016-04-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |