LA HB336 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Atchafalaya Basin Bridge Commission and the Atchafalaya Basin Bridge Commission police (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the Atchafalaya Basin Bridge Commission and the Atchafalaya Basin Bridge Commission police (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2022. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. |
2022-05-23 | House | Reported favorably (7-4). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |