LA HB336 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates funds for payment of judgment in the matter of "James Morvant v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company, State of Louisiana through the DOTD, and Plaquemines Parish"

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates funds for payment of judgment in the matter of "James Morvant v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company, State of Louisiana through the DOTD, and Plaquemines Parish"

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2013-04-01HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
2013-03-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2013-03-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback