LA HB335 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date: 06/19/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires food service establishments serving imported crawfish or shrimp to inform patrons that the seafood is of foreign origin (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires food service establishments serving imported crawfish or shrimp to inform patrons that the seafood is of foreign origin (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors

Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. James Armes [D]Rep. Robert Billiot [D]
Rep. Stuart Bishop [R]Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Terry Brown [I]Rep. Patrick Connick [R]
Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. John Guinn [R]Rep. Christopher Leopold [R]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]
Rep. Tanner Magee [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. James Morris [R]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]
Rep. Patricia Smith [D]Rep. A.B. Franklin [D]Rep. Dorothy Hill [D]Rep. Frank Howard [R]
Rep. Terry Landry [D]Rep. Mark Abraham [R]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]
Rep. Gary Carter [D]Rep. Reid Falconer [R]Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Cedric Glover [D]
Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]
Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Sam Jones [D]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]
Rep. Sherman Mack [R]Rep. Joseph Marino [I]Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]
Rep. Gregory Miller [R]Rep. Pat Moore [D]Rep. Stuart Moss [R]Rep. Nicholas Muscarello [R]
Rep. Barbara Norton [D]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Steve Pylant [R]Rep. Jerome Richard [I]
Rep. Scott Simon [R]Rep. Joseph Stagni [D]Rep. John Stefanski [R]Sen. John Alario [R]
Sen. R Allain [R]Sen. Regina Barrow [D]Sen. Troy Carter [D]Sen. Norby Chabert [R]
Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]Sen. Dale Erdey [R]Sen. Ryan Gatti [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]
Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]Sen. John Milkovich [D]Sen. Fred Mills [R]Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D]
Sen. Dan Morrish [R]Sen. Karen Peterson [D]Sen. Edward Price [D]Sen. Gary Smith [D]
Sen. John Smith [R]Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]Sen. Michael Walsworth [R]Sen. Rick Ward [D]
Rep. Walt Leger [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 335 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#770) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 335 CO-AUTHORS (#546) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 335 FINAL PASSAGE (#545) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 335 FINAL PASSAGE (#185) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseEffective date: 06/19/2019.
2019-06-20HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 372.
2019-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-02HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/19.
2019-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-05-28SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-23SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-22SenateReported with amendments.
2019-05-08SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-05-07SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-07HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/07/19.
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably (11-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB335&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120774
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127396
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140283
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144523
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136688
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138966
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140249
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120776
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126408
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127759
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127866
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136695
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141656
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132086
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138635
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138637

Bill Comments

feedback