LA HB333 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-21 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-21 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exceptions in the GRAD Act relative to remedial education course offerings by certain public universities
Title
Provides exceptions in the GRAD Act relative to remedial education course offerings by certain public universities
Sponsors
Sen. Wesley Bishop [D] | Rep. Austin Badon [D] | Sen. Joseph Bouie [D] | Rep. Randal Gaines [D] |
Sen. Katrina Jackson-Andrews [D] | Rep. Marcus Hunter [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 333 FINAL PASSAGE (#429) (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 63, nays 27. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2015. |
2015-05-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |