LA HB333 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the maximum work hours required of certain employees of the Lake Charles Fire Dept.
Title
Provides relative to the maximum work hours required of certain employees of the Lake Charles Fire Dept.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 333, FINAL PASSAGE (#662) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 333, FINAL PASSAGE (#381) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 333, FINAL PASSAGE (#381) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2011-06-28 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 274. | |
2011-06-20 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-19 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-16 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-16 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-06-16 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-15 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-14 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-14 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-13 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-06-06 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-27 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2011. | |
2011-05-26 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2011-05-25 | Reported favorably (14-0) (Local and Consent). | |
2011-04-28 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2011-04-27 | Read by title. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |