LA HB332 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends criminal penalties for certain offenses involving Schedule I narcotic substances (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Amends criminal penalties for certain offenses involving Schedule I narcotic substances (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 332 FINAL PASSAGE (#232) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-04-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-03-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/2014. |
2014-03-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-26 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2014-02-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2014-02-24 | House | Prefiled. |