LA HB331 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes transportation network companies to provide nonemergency medical transportation services through the state Medicaid program and all other publicly and privately issued health insurance plans (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Authorizes transportation network companies to provide nonemergency medical transportation services through the state Medicaid program and all other publicly and privately issued health insurance plans (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |