LA HB331 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Effective date: 06/18/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the sound recording investment credit to a refundable tax credit and authorizes an additional base investment tax credit for resident copyrighted sound recordings (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the sound recording investment credit to a refundable tax credit and authorizes an additional base investment tax credit for resident copyrighted sound recordings (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 331 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1050) (Y: 78 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 331 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#891) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 331 FINAL PASSAGE (#846) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 331 FINAL PASSAGE (#76) (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19HouseEffective date: 06/18/2019.
2019-06-19HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 363.
2019-06-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-06HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-06HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 78, nays 11, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-06-06HouseNotice the Senate discharged the Conference Committee.
2019-06-06SenateSenate Conference Committee members discharged.
2019-06-06SenateNotice the House discharged the Conference Committee.
2019-06-06HouseDischarged from Conference Committee.
2019-06-05SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2019-06-05HouseHouse conferees appointed: Leger, Abramson, and Jimmy Harris.
2019-06-04HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2019-06-04SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Donahue, and Peacock.
2019-06-03SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2019-06-03HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2019-06-02HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-02SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-06-01SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-31SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-21SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2019-05-21SenateSenate Committee amendments read and adopted.
2019-05-20SenateReported with amendments.
2019-05-01SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-04-30SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-29HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 17. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/29/19.
2019-04-24HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-23HouseReported with amendments (15-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB331&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120647
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126615
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128625
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143580
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144514
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126414
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126077
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128413
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135493
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135950
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140588
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140110
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140898
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141511
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141956
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143553
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120657
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124228
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126786
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127000
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128797
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131704
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135768
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140599
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143863
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128560
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141177

Bill Comments

feedback