LA HB331 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Effective date: 07/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for payment of the Oilfield Site Restoration Fund fee (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for payment of the Oilfield Site Restoration Fund fee (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 331 FINAL PASSAGE (#580) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Vote on HB 331 FINAL PASSAGE (#398) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseEffective date: 07/01/2018.
2018-05-10HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 84.
2018-05-01HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-04-27HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-04-26SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-25SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-24SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-23SenateReported favorably.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2018-04-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-12HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/12/18.
2018-04-06HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-05HouseReported with amendments (14-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2018-03-01HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2018-03-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB331&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1071082
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083508
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086043
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090738
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096968
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077655
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083461
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083717
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1071096
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1081852
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083656
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085280
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086190
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088250
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092551
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1107192
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086006
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090496

Bill Comments

feedback