LA HB331 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Effective date: August 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Effective date: August 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes licensed practical nurses to administer chemical tests for intoxication
Title
Authorizes licensed practical nurses to administer chemical tests for intoxication
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 331 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1107) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 331 FINAL PASSAGE (#1007) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote on HB 331 FINAL PASSAGE (#45) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 331 FINAL PASSAGE (#1007) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote on HB 331 FINAL PASSAGE (#45) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2014. |
2014-06-09 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 551. |
2014-05-29 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-27 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-21 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2014-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/2014. |
2014-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-03-18 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-03-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/18/2014. |
2014-03-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-12 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2014-02-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2014-02-24 | House | Prefiled. |