LA HB331 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain local governmental subdivisions to adopt and enforce local codes of conduct or ethics ordinances
Title
Authorizes certain local governmental subdivisions to adopt and enforce local codes of conduct or ethics ordinances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 331, FINAL PASSAGE (#441) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 331, FINAL PASSAGE (#211) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 331, FINAL PASSAGE (#211) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2011-06-14 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 37. | |
2011-06-13 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-13 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-09 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-08 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-06-08 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-02 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-01 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-31 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2011-05-18 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2011-05-18 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-12 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/18/2011. | |
2011-05-12 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-11 | Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled. |