LA HB330 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for insurance producer prelicensing program requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for insurance producer prelicensing program requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 330 FINAL PASSAGE (#470) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Vote on HB 330 FINAL PASSAGE (#65) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01HouseEffective date: 08/01/2018.
2018-05-01HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 10.
2018-04-25HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-04-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-04-23HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-04-19HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-04-19SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-16SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-12SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-11SenateReported favorably.
2018-03-21SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2018-03-20SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-03-20HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-03-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/20/18.
2018-03-15HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-14HouseReported favorably (8-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2018-03-01HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2018-03-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback