LA HB330 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-01 - Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-01 - Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the powers and duties of the city of Bastrop with respect to expropriation of property and to acquisition and operation of utilities
Title
Provides relative to the powers and duties of the city of Bastrop with respect to expropriation of property and to acquisition and operation of utilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 330, FINAL PASSAGE (#357) (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 330, AMENDMENT # 169 BY BARROW, MOTION TO ADOPT (#356) (Y: 22 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2011-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 330, AMENDMENT # 169 BY BARROW, MOTION TO ADOPT (#356) (Y: 22 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 6. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2011. | |
2011-05-24 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-23 | Reported favorably (17-0) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled. |