LA HB328 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-9-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes an exemption from local sales taxes for feminine hygiene products and diapers (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes an exemption from local sales taxes for feminine hygiene products and diapers (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 328 FINAL PASSAGE (#393) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 328 FINAL PASSAGE (#132) (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 328 FINAL PASSAGE (#132) (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09HouseEffective date: 08/01/2020.
2020-06-09HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 138.
2020-06-01HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-05-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-28HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-28HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-05-27SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-21SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-05-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-07HouseReported with amendments (14-3).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2020-02-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2020-02-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB328&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1161407
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169204
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173207
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176706
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181447
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168998
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169197
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169418
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1161425
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1165899
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169238
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171426
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173231
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173363
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177130
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1186941
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173065
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173292
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176580

Bill Comments

feedback