LA HB328 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain reductions in the number of positions in the executive branch of state government (EG DECREASE EX See Note)
Title
Requires certain reductions in the number of positions in the executive branch of state government (EG DECREASE EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 328, FINAL PASSAGE (#869) (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | |
2012-05-15 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-05-15 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 5. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-08 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2012. | |
2012-05-08 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-07 | Reported favorably (17-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-02-27 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2012-02-27 | Prefiled. |