LA HB326 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals exemption for Washington Parish from the moratorium on additional nursing facilities or beds
Title
Repeals exemption for Washington Parish from the moratorium on additional nursing facilities or beds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 326, FINAL PASSAGE (#753) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 326, FINAL PASSAGE (#412) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 326, FINAL PASSAGE (#412) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2011-06-24 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 179. | |
2011-06-22 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-22 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-20 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-20 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-19 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-16 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-15 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-06-06 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2011-06-06 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-27 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/6/2011. | |
2011-05-25 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-24 | Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular). | |
2011-05-03 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2011-05-02 | Read by title. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |