LA HB325 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-03 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-03 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the La. State Employees' Retirement System (LASERS), allows certain individuals to rescind their originally selected retirement option under certain circumstances (OR NO IMPACT APV)
Title
Relative to the La. State Employees' Retirement System (LASERS), allows certain individuals to rescind their originally selected retirement option under certain circumstances (OR NO IMPACT APV)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2011-05-02 | Read by title. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=11RS&billid=HB325 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=740387 |