LA HB324 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-29 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-29 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes an income tax rebate for donations to certain schools (RE DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes an income tax rebate for donations to certain schools (RE DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 324 FINAL PASSAGE (#646) (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2013-05-29 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 34. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013. |
2013-05-28 | House | Rules suspended. Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-28 | House | Reported with amendments (9-3) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-03-27 | House | Prefiled. |