LA HB322 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires birthing facilities to perform pulse oximetric screening for certain heart defects on each newborn in the care of those facilities
Title
Requires birthing facilities to perform pulse oximetric screening for certain heart defects on each newborn in the care of those facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 322 FINAL PASSAGE (#699) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 322 CO-AUTHORS (#698) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 322 FINAL PASSAGE (#314) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 322 CO-AUTHORS (#698) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 322 FINAL PASSAGE (#314) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2013. |
2013-06-20 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 407. |
2013-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-29 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-08 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/8/2013. |
2013-05-01 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-03-27 | House | Prefiled. |