LA HB321 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the reporting of positions and funding to the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the reporting of positions and funding to the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 321 FINAL PASSAGE (#1172) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 321 FINAL PASSAGE (#638) (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-05-30HouseVeto message received and read. Lies over under the rules. (Hand delivered on 05/27/18.)
2018-05-17HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-16HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-15HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-05-15SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-11SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-11SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-10SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2018-04-30SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-30HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 11. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/30/18.
2018-04-24HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-23HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2018-03-01HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2018-03-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB321&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1071059
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088987
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097504
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1071083
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078679
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089270
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089886
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098410
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102004
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1091437
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097458

Bill Comments

feedback