LA HB321 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to expedited jury trials
Title
Provides relative to expedited jury trials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 321 FINAL PASSAGE (#216) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 321 FINAL PASSAGE (#216) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 321 FINAL PASSAGE (#216) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-01 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/1/2013. |
2013-04-24 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2013-03-27 | House | Prefiled. |