LA HB320 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the composition of the La. State Board of Nursing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the composition of the La. State Board of Nursing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 320 FINAL PASSAGE (#74) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2020-05-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-07HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2020-02-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2020-02-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback