LA HB319 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a credit against individual income tax for the owner of a newly constructed one- or two-family dwelling which includes certain accessible and barrier-free design elements (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes a credit against individual income tax for the owner of a newly constructed one- or two-family dwelling which includes certain accessible and barrier-free design elements (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 319, FINAL PASSAGE (#972) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - House Vote on HB 319, GRANTING SENATE PERMISSION (#904) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 319, 2/3 vote (#941) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 319, FINAL PASSAGE (#472) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - House Vote on HB 319, GRANTING SENATE PERMISSION (#904) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 319, 2/3 vote (#941) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 319, FINAL PASSAGE (#472) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2011-07-01 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 392. | |
2011-06-23 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-23 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-23 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-22 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-06-22 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-22 | Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day. | |
2011-06-22 | By a vote of 83 yeas, 0 nays the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day. | |
2011-06-22 | Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day. | |
2011-06-22 | Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57TH calendar day by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays. | |
2011-06-21 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-21 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-09 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2011-06-08 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-06 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/8/2011. | |
2011-06-06 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-02 | Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled. |