LA HB316 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 160.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 160.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts single axle two-wheel trailers from motor vehicle inspection requirements (EN DECREASE SG RV See Note)
Title
Exempts single axle two-wheel trailers from motor vehicle inspection requirements (EN DECREASE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Burford [R] | Rep. Terry Brown [I] | Rep. Kenny Cox [D] | Rep. John Guinn [R] |
Rep. Dorothy Hill [D] | Rep. Dalton Honore [D] | Rep. Frank Howard [R] | Rep. Steve Pylant [R] |
Sen. Ben Nevers [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 316 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#826) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 316 FINAL PASSAGE (#623) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House Vote on HB 316 FINAL PASSAGE (#113) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 316 FINAL PASSAGE (#623) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House Vote on HB 316 FINAL PASSAGE (#113) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 160. |
2014-05-22 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2014. |
2014-05-14 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-13 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-12 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2014-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2014. |
2014-05-05 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-03-26 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-03-26 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2014-03-26 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2014-03-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/26/2014. |
2014-03-19 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported with amendments (12-2). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2014-02-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2014-02-24 | House | Prefiled. |