LA HB313 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the recognition of separate legal personalities among affiliated corporations and other business entities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the recognition of separate legal personalities among affiliated corporations and other business entities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 313 FINAL PASSAGE (#416) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 313 HB 313 BY PRESSLY (#216) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-15HouseVeto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
2020-06-14SenateVeto message from the Governor received and read.
2020-06-12HouseVetoed by the Governor.
2020-06-01HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-05-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-28HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-28HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-05-27SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-26SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-26SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-21SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2020-05-20SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-05-20HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/20.
2020-05-15HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-13HouseReported with amendments (15-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2020-02-26HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2020-02-26HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB313&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1161063
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171176
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174658
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176753
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170826
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170903
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174172
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1161082
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171271
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174799
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181945
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1186010
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174641
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176635

Bill Comments

feedback