LA HB313 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Limits monies deposited into the Transportation Trust Fund from being used to pay for certain Dept. of Transportation and Development expenses (EG +$32,500,000 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits monies deposited into the Transportation Trust Fund from being used to pay for certain Dept. of Transportation and Development expenses (EG +$32,500,000 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 313 FINAL PASSAGE (#428) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2019-05-21SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-20HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 58, nays 40. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-20HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-14HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
2019-05-14HouseNotice given.
2019-05-14HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseReported with amendments (16-2).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-03-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-03-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback