LA HB313 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the council of the La. State Law Institute
Title
Provides relative to the council of the La. State Law Institute
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 313, FINAL PASSAGE (#1035) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 313, FINAL PASSAGE (#595) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 313, FINAL PASSAGE (#595) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Effective date: August 1, 2012. | |
2012-05-22 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 188. | |
2012-05-17 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-05-16 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-15 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2012-05-15 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-14 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-10 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-09 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-05-02 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-05-01 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-05-01 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/1/2012. | |
2012-04-19 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2012-04-18 | Reported favorably (10-0) (Local and Consent). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-02-27 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-02-27 | Prefiled. |