LA HB313 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-12)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Effective date: July 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-12)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Effective date: July 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state buildings to provide suitable areas for breastfeeding and lactation (EN +$42,000 GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires state buildings to provide suitable areas for breastfeeding and lactation (EN +$42,000 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 313, FINAL PASSAGE (#752) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 313, FINAL PASSAGE (#503) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 313, FINAL PASSAGE (#503) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | Effective date: July 1, 2012. | |
2011-06-28 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 269. | |
2011-06-22 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-22 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-20 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-20 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-19 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-16 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-15 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-06-13 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | |
2011-06-09 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-08 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/9/2011. | |
2011-06-08 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-07 | Reported with amendments (23-0) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled. |