LA HB307 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to bribery and intimidation of public officials and law enforcement officers (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to bribery and intimidation of public officials and law enforcement officers (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 307 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#889) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 307 FINAL PASSAGE (#735) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 307 FINAL PASSAGE (#284) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 307 FINAL PASSAGE (#735) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 307 FINAL PASSAGE (#284) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2019. |
2019-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 311. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2019-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19. |
2019-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-14 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19. |
2019-05-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably (9-0-1). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2019-03-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2019-03-28 | House | Prefiled. |