LA HB307 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Effective date: 06/14/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires a tax clearance from the Dept. of Revenue for certain licenses, permits, tax resale certificates, and state contracts (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a tax clearance from the Dept. of Revenue for certain licenses, permits, tax resale certificates, and state contracts (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 307 FINAL PASSAGE (#716) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 307 FINAL PASSAGE (#392) (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14HouseEffective date: 06/14/17.
2017-06-14HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 211.
2017-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2017-06-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-04HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2017-06-02SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-05-31SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-31SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-30SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2017-05-24SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2017-05-23SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-05-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 22. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/17.
2017-05-16HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-05-15HouseReported with amendments (8-6).
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2017-03-30HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2017-03-30HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB307&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1029855
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041792
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043935
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048171
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1051519
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1036892
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041270
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041305
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041666
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041867
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043354
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1029876
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1037048
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041851
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043162
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043966
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044154
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048830
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1053300
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043825
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047745

Bill Comments

feedback