LA HB307 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 53. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 53. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Tulane University scholarships for students nominated by legislators, provides relative to requirements, procedures, limitations, and publication of information
Title
Concerning Tulane University scholarships for students nominated by legislators, provides relative to requirements, procedures, limitations, and publication of information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 307 FINAL PASSAGE (#588) (Y: 44 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 53. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-23 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2014-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2014. |
2014-04-16 | House | Notice given. |
2014-04-16 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2014-04-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2014-04-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2014-04-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2014. |
2014-04-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-04-09 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-02-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-02-24 | House | Prefiled. |