LA HB304 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates funds for the expenses of the judiciary for Fiscal Year 2020-2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates funds for the expenses of the judiciary for Fiscal Year 2020-2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-26 - House - House Vote on HB 304 HB 304 BY ZERINGUE (#431) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-26SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2020-05-26HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/26/20.
2020-05-21HouseMade Special Order of the day No. 9 for 05/26/20.
2020-05-21HouseReported with amendments (23-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2020-02-26HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2020-02-26HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB304&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1160847
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175175
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175912
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176065
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174164
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175078
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175810
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1160883
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175209
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176136
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176042

Bill Comments

feedback