LA HB3 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Effective date: June 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Effective date: June 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the Omnibus Bond Act
Title
Provides for the Omnibus Bond Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 3 FINAL PASSAGE (#886) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 3 FINAL PASSAGE (#448) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 3 FINAL PASSAGE (#448) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | House | Effective date: June 25, 2013. |
2013-06-25 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 34. |
2013-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 3 for 06/01. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-15 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2013. |
2013-05-14 | House | Notice given. |
2013-05-14 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2013. |
2013-05-07 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported favorably (18-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-04-16 | House | Read by title. |