LA HB299 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective date: June 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective date: June 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the reporting date for submitting the postsecondary education funding formula to the legislature
Title
Changes the reporting date for submitting the postsecondary education funding formula to the legislature
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 299 FINAL PASSAGE (#884) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 299 FINAL PASSAGE (#518) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 299 FINAL PASSAGE (#518) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | House | Effective date: June 14, 2013. |
2013-06-14 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 280. |
2013-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-21 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/21/2013. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-03-27 | House | Prefiled. |