LA HB299 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 37, nays 56. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 37, nays 56. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Exempts public postsecondary education tuition amounts and mandatory fees from requirements for imposing a new or increasing an existing tax or fee
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Exempts public postsecondary education tuition amounts and mandatory fees from requirements for imposing a new or increasing an existing tax or fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 299, FINAL PASSAGE (#718) (Y: 37 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 37, nays 56. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-02 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/8/2012. | |
2012-05-02 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-01 | Reported without amendments (12-0) (Regular). | |
2012-04-19 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2012-04-18 | Reported favorably (7-3) (Regular) To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-02-27 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-02-27 | Prefiled. |