LA HB294 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changes references to "at-risk" students to students who are "economically disadvantaged" throughout Title 17 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Changes references to "at-risk" students to students who are "economically disadvantaged" throughout Title 17 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 294 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#844) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 294 FINAL PASSAGE (#680) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Vote on HB 294 FINAL PASSAGE (#63) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 294 FINAL PASSAGE (#680) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Vote on HB 294 FINAL PASSAGE (#63) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 307. |
2018-05-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-10 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/09/18. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/20/18. |
2018-03-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-14 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |