LA HB29 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the optional selection of payment of survivor benefits for a surviving spouse of a member of the Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Louisiana (EN NO IMPACT APV)
Title
Provides for the optional selection of payment of survivor benefits for a surviving spouse of a member of the Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Louisiana (EN NO IMPACT APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 29 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#796) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 29 FINAL PASSAGE (#660) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 29 FINAL PASSAGE (#92) (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 29 FINAL PASSAGE (#660) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 29 FINAL PASSAGE (#92) (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 185. |
2018-05-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-08 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/08/18. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/22/18. |
2018-03-19 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported favorably (7-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2018-01-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2018. |
2018-01-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2018-01-25 | House | Prefiled. |